Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Siro González Bacallao

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pinar del Rio, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1930Born
28 Feb 195423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
30 Mar 198251.3AppointedBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
16 May 198251.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
13 Dec 200676.0RetiredBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
19 Jul 202190.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Pinar del Rio, Cuba

MicroData Summary for José Siro González Bacallao
Bishop José Siro González Bacallao (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pinar del Rio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCandelaria
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pinar del Rio, Diocese of Pinar del Rio
Death PlaceMantua

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 6,031
  • d: CB, 19 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Jul 2021

Quantcast