Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[SSPX Bishop Alfonso de Galarreta], S.S.P.X.

Society of St. Pius X

Not in Union with the Holy See

Bishop


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1957 Born
Aug 1980³23.5Ordained PriestPriest of [Society of Saint Pius X (SSPX)]
30 Jun 198831.4Ordained BishopBishop

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Galarreta
Bishop Alfonso de Galarreta S.S.P.X. (born ) Bishop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorrelavega, Spain
Ordained PriestBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Ordained BishopSSPX, Seminary, Écône, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,634
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast