Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fausto Feliciano Gaibor García

Deceased

Bishop of Tulcán, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1952Born
24 Jan 198129.0Ordained PriestPriest of Guaranda, Ecuador
31 Oct 200654.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Riobamba, Ecuador
31 Oct 200654.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Naraggara
2 Dec 200654.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naraggara
3 May 201159.2AppointedBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador
4 Jun 202169.3DiedBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Fausto Feliciano Gaibor García
Bishop Fausto Feliciano Gaibor García (born , died ) Bishop of Tulcán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuaranda
Ordained BishopCathedral, Riobamba, Diocese of Riobamba
Death PlaceTulcán, Diocese of Tulcán

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,289
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 May 2011
  • d: CB, 5 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Jun 2021

Quantcast