Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Vianney Fernando

Bishop Emeritus of Kandy, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1942 Born
21 Dec 196624.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 198340.6AppointedBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
21 May 198340.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka
9 Oct 202179.1RetiredBishop of Kandy, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Joseph Vianney Fernando
Bishop Joseph Vianney Fernando (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kandy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuruliapitiya-Negombo
Ordained BishopKandy, Diocese of Kandy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kandy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,092
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Oct 2021

Quantcast