Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop 聲gel Falz鏮, O.F.M.

Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1957 Born
2 Oct 197719.9First VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
10 Oct 198224.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 198426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 May 202466.5AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
29 Jun 202466.7Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

MicroData Summary for 聲gel Falz鏮
(WikiData: Q125930101)
Bishop 聲gel Falz鏮 O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Comayagua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaxxar, Archdiocese of Malta
Ordained BishopInmaculada Concepci鏮, Cathedral, Comayagua, Diocese of Comayagua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Comayagua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2024
  • firs: CB, 14 May 2024
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 May 2024
  • c34: CB, 29 Jun 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 29 Jun 2024