Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petr Esterka

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brno, Czechia

Titular Bishop of Cefala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1935Born
9 Mar 196327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brno, Czechia
5 Jul 199963.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brno, Czechia
5 Jul 199963.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cefala
11 Sep 199963.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cefala
9 Dec 201378.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brno, Czechia
10 Aug 202185.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brno, Czechia

MicroData Summary for Petr Esterka
Bishop Petr Esterka (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDoini Bojanovice
Ordained PriestLateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaints Pierre and Paul, Cathedral, Brno, Diocese of Brno
Death PlaceAnaheim, Diocese of Orange in California, USA

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,608
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2013
  • d/c1: CB, 10 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Aug 2021

Quantcast