Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Antonio Díaz

Bishop-Elect of Concepción, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1960 Born
14 Dec 198525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Catamarca, Argentina
26 Jun 202160.6AppointedBishop of Concepción, Argentina
12 Aug 202160.8Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Díaz
Father José Antonio Díaz (born ) Bishop-Elect of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Cano
Ordained BishopEstadio Concepción Fútbol Club, Concepción, Diocese of Concepción

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Concepción.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 28 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 6 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 16 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast