Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús María de Jesús Moya

Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1934 Born
18 Mar 196126.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 197742.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
13 Apr 197742.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxita
21 May 197742.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxita
20 Apr 198449.3AppointedBishop of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic
31 May 201277.5RetiredBishop of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Jesús María de Jesús Moya
Bishop Jesús María de Jesús Moya (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco de Macorís

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSabana Angosta
Ordained BishopSantiago de los Caballeros, Diocese of Santiago de los Caballeros

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Francisco de Macorís.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 31 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,865

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast