Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ramón Alfredo de la Cruz Baldera

Bishop-Elect of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1961 Born
12 Jan 199129.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic
15 May 202159.8AppointedBishop of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic
24 Jul 202160.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Ramón Alfredo de la Cruz Baldera
Father Ramón Alfredo de la Cruz Baldera (born ) Bishop-Elect of San Francisco de Macorís

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco de Macorís, Diocese of La Vega
Ordained BishopEstadio Julián Javier, San Francisco de Macorís, Diocese of San Francisco de Macorís

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of San Francisco de Macorís.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2021
  • ob: CB, 10 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jun 2021

Quantcast