Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fausto Ramón Mejía Vallejo

Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1941 Born
26 Nov 197230.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Vega, Dominican Republic
31 May 201270.4AppointedBishop of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic
28 Jul 201270.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic
15 May 202179.4RetiredBishop of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Fausto Ramón Mejía Vallejo
Bishop Fausto Ramón Mejía Vallejo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Francisco de Macorís

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBejucal, Bonao
Ordained Bishopstade Julián Javier, San Francisco de Macorís, Diocese of San Francisco de Macorís

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Francisco de Macorís.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2012
  • ob: CB, 1 Jun 2012
  • c2: CB, 26 Jul 2012
  • c34: CB, 28 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,512
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Sep 2021

Quantcast