Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Colin Cameron Davies, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ngong, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1924Born
1951²26.5Perpetual VowsMember of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
13 Jul 195228.0Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
9 Jul 196440.0AppointedPrefect of Ngong, Kenya
9 Dec 197652.4AppointedBishop of Ngong, Kenya
27 Feb 197752.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ngong, Kenya
23 Nov 200278.4RetiredBishop of Ngong, Kenya
8 Jan 201792.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ngong, Kenya

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Colin Cameron Davies (VIAF: 316878852)
Bishop Colin Cameron Davies M.H.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ngong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLas Palmas, Canary Islands, Diocese of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
Ordained PriestSt Joseph’s, College, Mill Hill, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopHoly Family, Cathedral, Nairobi, Archdiocese of Nairobi
Death PlaceHerbert House, Formby, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 10 Jan 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 23 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,652
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast