Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Stephen Chow Sau-yan, S.J.

Bishop-Elect of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1959 Born
27 Sep 198425.1EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
27 Sep 198627.1First VowsMember of Society of Jesus
16 Jul 199434.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
17 Apr 200747.6Final VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
17 May 202161.7AppointedBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
4 Dec 202162.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

MicroData Summary for Stephen Chow Sau-yan
Father Stephen Chow Sau-yan S.J. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Hong Kong, Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 May 2021
  • c1/ob: CB, 17 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 May 2021

Quantcast