Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicola Cardinal Capocci

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1341AppointedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
20 Nov 1342ResignedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
13 Jun 1348AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
17 Dec 1350AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
17 Dec 1350Elevated to Cardinal
1361²AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
26 Jul 1368DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Capocci
Nicola Cardinal Capocci (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMontefiascone, Diocese of Montefiascone, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1350
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 510

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast