Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Buezo Leiva

Bishop of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1962 Born
25 Nov 198825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas, Guatemala
9 Feb 201350.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Izabal, Guatemala
9 Feb 201350.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
4 May 201350.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
16 Jul 202158.5AppointedBishop of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Domingo Buezo Leiva
Bishop Domingo Buezo Leiva (born ) Bishop of Sololá-Chimaltenango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Horcones
Ordained BishopSan José, Church, Morales

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sololá-Chimaltenango.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Feb 2013
  • c34: CB, 4 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,783
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Jul 2021

Quantcast