Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mykhaylo Bubniy, C.SS.R.

Archiepiscopal Exarch of Odessa (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Thubursicum-Bure

Archiepiscopal Administrator of Krym (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1970 Born
19 Aug 199221.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 Apr 199625.5Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Aug 199726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Feb 201443.4AppointedArchiepiscopal Exarch of Odessa (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 Feb 201443.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubursicum-Bure
13 Feb 201443.4AppointedArchiepiscopal Administrator of Krym (Ukrainian), Ukraine
7 Apr 201443.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thubursicum-Bure
12 Apr 201443.5InstalledArchiepiscopal Exarch of Odessa (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Mykhaylo Bubniy
Bishop Mykhaylo Bubniy C.SS.R. (born ) Archiepiscopal Exarch of Odessa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKhlivchany
Ordained BishopRésurrection de Notre Seigneur, Cathedral, Kyiv, Archeparchy of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Odessa (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2/i: CB, 14 Feb 2014
  • c34: CB, 6 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,141
  • zadm: CB, 4 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast