Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrea Cardinal Bontempi Martini

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateEventTitle
1353²SelectedBishop of Perugia, Italy
2 May 1354ConfirmedBishop of Perugia, Italy
18 Sep 1378Elevated to Cardinal
18 Sep 1378AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
16 Jul 1390DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Bontempi Martini
Andrea Cardinal Bontempi Martini (died ) Bishop of Perugia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia
Death PlaceRecanati, Diocese of Recanati
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Recanati, Diocese of Recanati

  • a cardinal for 11.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast