Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Antonio Paolo Bonanno

Bishop of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1947 Born
27 Jun 197123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cosenza, Italy
7 Jan 201163.2AppointedBishop of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy
25 Mar 201163.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy
2 Apr 201163.4InstalledBishop of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Antonio Paolo Bonanno
Bishop Leonardo Antonio Paolo Bonanno (born ) Bishop of San Marco Argentano-Scalea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giovanni in Fiore, Archdiocese of Cosenza
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cosenza, Archdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Marco Argentano-Scalea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,974
  • c1/loc: AM, 29 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast