Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vittorio Luigi Mondello

Archbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1937 Born
21 Jun 196022.6Ordained PriestPriest of Messina, Italy
10 Dec 197740.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
10 Dec 197740.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Carcabia
21 Jan 197840.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carcabia
30 Jul 198345.7AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
28 Jul 199052.7AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy
13 Jul 201375.7RetiredArchbishop of Reggio Calabria-Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Luigi Mondello
Archbishop Vittorio Luigi Mondello (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria-Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Ordained BishopCathedral, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria-Bova.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Jul 2021

Quantcast