Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal Bevilacqua, C.O. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo della Caritą a Via Giulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1881Born
13 Jun 190826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
15 Feb 196583.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gaudiaba
18 Feb 196583.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gaudiaba
22 Feb 196583.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Feb 196583.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo della Caritą a Via Giulia
6 May 196583.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo della Caritą a Via Giulia

MicroData Summary for Giulio Bevilacqua (VIAF: 27193662)
Giulio Cardinal Bevilacqua C.O. (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Girolamo della Caritą a Via Giulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsola della Scala, Italy

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
  • a cardinal for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast