Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Bettazzi

Bishop Emeritus of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1923 Born
4 Aug 194622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
10 Aug 196339.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
10 Aug 196339.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
4 Oct 196339.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
26 Nov 196643.0AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
15 Jan 196743.1InstalledBishop of Ivrea, Italy
20 Feb 199975.2RetiredBishop of Ivrea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bettazzi (VIAF: 102133143)
Bishop Luigi Bettazzi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreviso, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained PriestCappella del Rosario, San Domenico, Basilica, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSan Petronio, Basilica, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ivrea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1963
  • opd/c1/loc: AM, 6 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Oct 2021

Quantcast