Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard César Augustin Barsi

Archbishop Emeritus of Monaco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1942 Born
28 Jun 196926.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 200057.7AppointedArchbishop of Monaco
8 Oct 200058.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monaco
21 Jan 202077.4RetiredArchbishop of Monaco

MicroData Summary for Bernard César Augustin Barsi
Archbishop Bernard César Augustin Barsi (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Monaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNice, Diocese of Nice, France
Ordained BishopGrimaldi Forum, Espace Ravel, Monte Carlo, Archdiocese of Monaco

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Monaco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,850
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Sep 2021

Quantcast