Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Argaya Goicoechea

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Sebastián, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1903Born
2 Jun 192824.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 195248.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
15 Aug 195248.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
26 Oct 195248.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
12 Sep 195753.7AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
18 Nov 196864.9AppointedBishop of San Sebastián, Spain
16 Feb 197975.2RetiredBishop of San Sebastián, Spain
12 Mar 199389.2DiedBishop Emeritus of San Sebastián, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Argaya Goicoechea (VIAF: 87648070)
Bishop Jacinto Argaya Goicoechea (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Sebastián

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVera de Bidasoa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 96
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 190
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,032, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast