Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Arabia

Apostolicus Vicariatus Arabiae Septentrionalis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Camillo Ballin, M.C.C.I., Vicar Apostolic
  • Francis George Adeodatus Micallef, O.C.D., Vicar Apostolic Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 31 May 2011
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Kuwait
  • Square Kilometers: 17,900 (6,913 Square Miles)
  • Description: Bahrain, Kuwait, Qatar, and Saudi Arabia
  • Official Web Site: http://www.avona.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 25362, Road 4603, House 137/125, Block 946, Awali, Bahrain
  • Telephone: 3950.4488; 1749.0929
  • Fax: 1749.0929

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kuwait
29 June 1953ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Arabia Prefecture Apostolic of Kuwait (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kuwait
2 December 1954ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kuwait Vicariate Apostolic of Kuwait
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Arabia
31 May 2011Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kuwait Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Arabia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kuwait
196616,000475,0003.4%444,0003125ap1967
197017,200733,1962.3%66121,4336314ap1971
198032,0001,270,0002.5%3474,5714303ap1981
198851,4301,834,7562.8%2577,3475305ap1991
1999151,0002,000,0007.5%15625,16615124ap2000
2000151,0002,000,0007.5%16721,57116134ap2001
2001153,0002,000,0007.7%26819,12516134ap2002
2002154,0002,500,0006.2%26819,25016134ap2003
2003156,0002,501,0006.2%27917,33317134ap2004
2004158,5002,650,0006.0%281015,85018134ap2005
2010300,0003,000,00010.0%6111717,647111123ap2011
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Arabia
20121,127,9542,650,00042.6%7162349,041116124ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 2 Jun 2013