Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Antonio Zuccheri

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1697Born
26 Jan 173941.2AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
1 Feb 173941.3Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
Jun 1778³80.6DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Zuccheri
Bishop Pietro Antonio Zuccheri (born , died Jun 1778) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Viti

  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 434
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018