Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julius Caesar Zollio

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1733BornAriminen
27 Jun 178551.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
28 Oct 178552.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
13 Apr 179561.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Athenae

MicroData Summary for Julius Caesar Zollio:
Archbishop Julius Caesar Zollio (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Athenae

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013