Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anselme François Werbrouck

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1692Born
15 Jun 171522.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 171522.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 174250.1SelectedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
15 Jul 174350.7ConfirmedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
29 Sep 174350.9Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
23 Jun 174552.7SelectedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
17 Jan 174653.2ConfirmedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
24 Dec 174755.2DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anselme François Werbrouck
Bishop Joseph Anselme François Werbrouck (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYpres

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 89, and Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,743, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast