Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan-Baptist de Castillion

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1680³BornBrussels
17 May 170423.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Mar 170524.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 174261.5SelectedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
24 Sep 174262.0ConfirmedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
8 Dec 174262.2SelectedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
20 May 174362.6ConfirmedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
14 Jul 174362.8Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
26 Jun 175372.7DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan-Baptist de Castillion:
Bishop Jan-Baptist de Castillion (born , died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 131, and Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015