Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolph Gottfried Volusius

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Diocletiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹BornNeu-Hanau
1642²25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
22 Jun 167659.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
22 Jun 167659.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletiana
13 Sep 167659.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocletiana
17 Mar 167962.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adolph Gottfried Volusius:
Bishop Adolph Gottfried Volusius (born 1617, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 23
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016