Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Aegidius Ursinus de Vivere

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹BornLeodien
Apr 1641³64.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 164164.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
28 Apr 164164.3Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
17 Apr 164770.3DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aegidius Ursinus de Vivere:
Patriarch Aegidius Ursinus de Vivere (died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a priest for 6.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 203
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 105, Number 640

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013