Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Carlo Visdomini Cortigiani

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1648BornFirenze
1677²28.1Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
24 May 168334.5AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
30 May 168334.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
15 Jan 170354.1AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
14 Oct 171364.9DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Carlo Visdomini Cortigiani:
Bishop Michele Carlo Visdomini Cortigiani (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 269, and Page 316
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Mar 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015