Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Virgili

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1774BornLongiano
23 Sep 179722.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 181944.3AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
18 Apr 181944.4Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
23 Sep 185580.8DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Virgili
Bishop Michele Virgili (born , died ) Bishop of Comacchio

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 157
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1819, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016