Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelico Vigilini, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1664Born
20 Sep 168722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Apr 172863.5AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
18 Apr 172863.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tropea, Italy
16 May 173166.5DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelico Vigilini
Bishop Angelico Vigilini O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018