Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico Vialardi, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1633BornCasale
3 Mar 168753.9AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
9 Mar 168753.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
6 Dec 171178.6DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrico Vialardi:
Bishop Enrico Vialardi B. (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 254
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 23 Apr 2015