Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Vespoli-Casanatte, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640¹BornNapoli
27 May 167535.4AppointedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
3 Jun 167535.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
13 Aug 171676.6DiedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vespoli-Casanatte:
Bishop Giovanni Vespoli-Casanatte C.R. (died ) Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli

  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 298
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015