Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Ventriglia

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1788Born
23 May 181224.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 184860.6SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
20 Apr 184961.0ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
24 Jun 184961.1Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
15 Mar 185263.9AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
10 Dec 185971.6DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Ventriglia
Bishop Gabriele Ventriglia (born , died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCurti, Archdiocese of Capua

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 168, and Page 228
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018