Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio de Turris

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1684BornVico Equense
9 Apr 170723.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 173146.8AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
18 Feb 173146.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
24 Jun 175975.2DiedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio de Turris:
Bishop Giulio de Turris (born , died ) Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1756
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013