Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Guarchi

Deceased

Bishop of Tinos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1679¹BornChios
1 Oct 171435.7AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
26 Sep 173859.7AppointedBishop of Tinos, Greece
31 Jan 176283.0DiedBishop of Tinos, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Guarchi:
Bishop Luigi Guarchi (born 1679, died ) Bishop of Tinos

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 343
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 408
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1714, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015