Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Chiaiese

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1659BornNapoli
9 Apr 168424.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 173171.3AppointedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
18 Feb 173171.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
Aug 173272.8DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Chiaiese:
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Chiaiese Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013