Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teofil Pašić (Passich), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Valachia (Križevci)

Titular Bishop of Plataea


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1738AppointedVicar Apostolic of Valachia (Križevci), Croatia
30 Aug 1738AppointedTitular Bishop of Plataea
20 Jan 1739Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plataea
15 May 1745RemovedVicar Apostolic of Valachia (Križevci), Croatia
1759¹DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Valachia (Križevci), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teofil Pašić (Passich)
Bishop Teofil Pašić (Passich) O.S.B.M. (died 1759) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Valachia

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341, and Page 455
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Jun 2016