Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Tseng Chien-tsi

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hwalien, Taiwan

Titular Bishop of Sululos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1942 Born
21 Mar 197229.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hwalien, Taiwan
22 May 199855.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hwalien, Taiwan
22 May 199855.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sululos
29 Aug 199855.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sululos
11 Dec 201775.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Hwalien, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Tseng Chien-tsi
Bishop John Baptist Tseng Chien-tsi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hwalien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChipen
Ordained BishopEast Vocational Training Center Hall, Taitung

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hwalien.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,374
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018