Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominic Tang Yee-ming (Deng Yiming), S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1908Born
193021.6ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
31 May 194133.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1 Oct 195042.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Guangzhou [Canton], China
1 Oct 195042.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Elatea
13 Feb 195142.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elatea
26 May 198173.0AppointedArchbishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China
27 Jun 199587.1DiedArchbishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China

MicroData Summary for Dominic Tang Yee-ming (Deng Yiming)
Archbishop Dominic Tang Yee-ming (Deng Yiming) S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Guangzhou [Canton]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHong Kong
Ordained BishopCanton, Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]
Death PlaceStamford, USA

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,736
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,951, Number 9
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 25 Jan 2020

Quantcast