Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Trucchi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mondovi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1621Born
10 Jun 164524.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 166746.5AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
18 Dec 166746.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
29 Jul 169776.1ResignedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Trucchi
Bishop Domenico Trucchi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mondovi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavigliano

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 249
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018