Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de la Torre Herrera

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1675³BornIgollo de Camargo
24 Jul 173055.2AppointedBishop of León, Spain
15 Oct 173055.5Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
1 Feb 173559.8DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de la Torre Herrera:
Bishop Francisco de la Torre Herrera (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 49, Number 201
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015