Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Annibale Tommasi

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1775BornCortona
7 Jun 180024.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 182044.7AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
11 Jun 182044.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
14 Apr 184569.6DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Annibale Tommasi
Bishop Annibale Tommasi (born , died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1820, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016