Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Ludovicus Tevenardi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1632³BornSaluces
22 May 165523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 May 168856.0AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
8 Jun 168856.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
17 May 169765.0DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Ludovicus Tevenardi:
Bishop Michael Ludovicus Tevenardi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 341
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015