Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Ansaldo Teloni

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1760BornTreia
21 May 178524.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 182463.6AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
30 May 182463.6Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
31 Jan 184685.3DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ansaldo Teloni:
Bishop Francesco Ansaldo Teloni (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013