Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Tarabay, O.L.M.

Bishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1967 Born
17 Oct 199224.9Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
11 Jul 199325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Lebanese Maronite (Maronite)
17 Apr 201345.4AppointedBishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia
25 May 201345.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite), Australia

MicroData Summary for Antoine Tarabay
Bishop Antoine Tarabay O.L.M. (born ) Bishop of Saint Maron of Sydney

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTannourine

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Maron of Sydney (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,794

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018