Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marquard Sebastian von Schenk von Stauffenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1644Born
10 Jun 168339.0SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
12 Aug 168642.2ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
Apr 1687³42.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 168742.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
9 Oct 169349.4DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marquard Sebastian von Schenk von Stauffenberg
Bishop Marquard Sebastian von Schenk von Stauffenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEichstätt
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bamberg, Diocese of Bamberg

  • a priest for 6.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,763

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast