Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Suardo, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Nov 1659AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
16 Nov 1659Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
29 Jul 1679DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Suardo
Archbishop Paolo Suardo C.O. (died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopGesu, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 324
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 35
  • ob/c2: AT, 4 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jan 2017