Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Struzzieri, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Todi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1706BornSenigallia
1729²22.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Apr 174539.0ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Passion
12 Oct 176458.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ajaccio, France
12 Oct 176458.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tium
23 Dec 176458.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tium
10 Sep 177064.4AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
18 Dec 177569.7AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
21 Jan 178073.8DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Struzzieri:
Bishop Tommaso Struzzieri C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Todi

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1779
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 79, and Page 406
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015